skip to content

Marjerrison, Stacey Leah

CPSO#: 90272

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marjerrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marjerrison ( CPSO# 90272 )

Business Address:
McMaster's Children Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STACEY LEAH MARJERRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARJERRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
EL - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2013