skip to content

Mariscal de Alba, Maria Andrea

CPSO#: 98337

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2027
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Madrid, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3131 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mariscal De Alba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mariscal de Alba ( CPSO# 98337 )

Business Address:
Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Spain

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective:01 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 15 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2012 to 31 May 2013
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Maria Andrea Mariscal de Alba may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Thoracic Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Mariscal de Alba holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Mariscal de Alba no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Mariscal de
                        Alba's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Mariscal  de Alba's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2020.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2027.