skip to content

Marin, Alina

CPSO#: 86616

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Adult Outpatient Psychiatry
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544 3400 Ext. 2567
Fax: (613) 544 9666 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2567
Fax: (613) 544-9666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alina Marin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marin ( CPSO# 86616 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active
 
            1.    Dr. Alina Marin may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  Queen's  University,  in  which  Dr.  Marin  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires when Dr. Marin no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.