skip to content

Margarido, Clarita Bandeira

CPSO#: 89230

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Obstetrical Anesthesia
Rm M5-318
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Clarita Margarido Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 29 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:04 May 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 04 May 2018 Active
             Dr. Clarita Bandeira Margarido may practise medicine independently in
            anaesthesiology.