skip to content

Marczuk, Dorota

CPSO#: 85714

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Bialystok University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Wonderland Rd North
London ON  N6H 3E2
Phone: (519) 488-1951
Fax: (866) 488-1457 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dorota Marczuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marczuk ( CPSO# 85714 )

Business Address:
595 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6H 3E2
Phone Number: 519-488-1951

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOROTA MARCZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCZUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008