skip to content

Marcu, Shai

CPSO#: 86044

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 May 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 27 May 2007
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Feb 2008
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2009