skip to content

Marcon, Norman Emilio

CPSO#: 19374

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Oct 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michael's Hospital Medical Records 30 Bond St Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 28 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020