skip to content

Marcolin, Lorenzo

CPSO#: 17044

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Oct 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1984