skip to content

Marcinkowski, Richard Andrew

CPSO#: 33048

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman St.
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4513 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marcinkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Marcinkowski ( CPSO# 33048 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Medical Records Location

Address: Bluewater Health 89 Norman St Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Date Received: 08 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019