skip to content

Marchuk, Jon Blair

CPSO#: 26419

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010