skip to content

Marchie, Augustine

CPSO#: 88827

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 647 873 8991
Fax: 647 873 8991 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Augustine Marchie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2021
Corporation Name: Dr Augustine Marchie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marchie ( CPSO# 88827 )

Business Address:
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AUGUSTINE MARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2011