skip to content

Marchi, Nicholas Alfred

CPSO#: 87590

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: (905) 871-1221 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Marchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Marchi ( CPSO# 87590 )

Business Address:
238 Bertie Street
Suite 7
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-1220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ALFRED MARCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011