skip to content

Maraj, Vikesh

CPSO#: 85807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N8S 4T9
Phone: (519) 974-2924
Fax: (519) 948-9033 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

2462 howard avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Maraj ( CPSO# 85807 )

Business Address:
5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N8S 4T9
Phone Number: (519) 974-2924

Business Address:
109 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-7181

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIKESH MARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAJ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008