skip to content

Maraj, Ramsarran

CPSO#: 28810

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#103-210 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5G8
Phone: (613) 962-5966
Fax: (613) 962-5230 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ramsarran Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maraj ( CPSO# 28810 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
210 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5G8
Phone Number: (613) 962-5966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 25 Apr 2019 Active
             As from April 25, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ramsarran Maraj, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mraj to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. RAMSARRAN MARAJ
                                          ("Dr. Maraj")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;

                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Maraj, certificate of registration number 28810, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that following a report that raised concerns
                  about my standard of practice in family medicine, I underwent remediation
                  and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report
                  subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of
                  practice in family medicine in file number 338563.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) After the initial meeting described at section 5(b)(ii), meet
                              with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved
                              by the College, biweekly for six (6) meetings, then monthly
                              for nine (9) meetings;
                  
                        (iv)  After the initial meeting described at section 5(b)(ii) and
                              during the Clinical Supervisor's first two (2) bi-weekly
                              meetings, perform direct observation of my patient encounters
                              for two (2) half-days;

                        (v)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              visit;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;

                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessor
                        dated August 28, 2018 and November 11, 2018, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

                  (h)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a review and written summary of the following policies and
                              guidelines:
                  
                              1.    Canadian ADHD Resource Alliance - Canadian ADHD
                                    Practice Guidelines
                  
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain - Recommendations related to urine drug
                                    screening

                              3.    College Policy: Medical Records; and
                  
                        (ii)  review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor the following
                              resources:
                  
                              1.    Choosing Wisely Canada - recommendations for family
                                    physicians;

                              2.    Tools to evaluate pediatric development, e.g. Rourke
                                    baby growth chart;
                  
                              3.    Tools to evaluate suicidal ideation, e.g. PDQ-9, GAD or
                                    Beck; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to complete this requirement by August 30,
                        2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.  I acknowledge that the
                        College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

                  (c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a report that raised concerns about Dr. Maraj's
                              standard of practice in family medicine, he underwent
                              remediation and a reassessment. The reassessment report
                              received by the College raised concerns about his standard of
                              practice in family medicine. As a result of the reassessment:
                  
                                    Dr. Maraj will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12
                                    months.

                                    Dr. Maraj will engage in professional education in
                                    medical recordkeeping, opioid prescribing and with
                                    respect to several clinical guidelines and tools.
                  
                                    Dr. Maraj's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College approximately six (6) months
                                    after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and

                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ramsarran Maraj to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2019:

Following a report that raised concerns about Dr. Maraj’s standard of practice in family medicine, he underwent remediation and a reassessment. The reassessment report received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Maraj will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Maraj will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, opioid prescribing and with respect to several clinical guidelines and tools.

Dr. Maraj’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately six (6) months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 12, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 26, 2019, Dr. Maraj has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)