skip to content

Manuel, Mogamat Arifie

CPSO#: 27255

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Arifie Manuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 250 Harding Boulevard West Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Date Received: 12 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2017