skip to content

Mansukhani, Tarun Ram

CPSO#: 92669

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Grace University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2361 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 1V7
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Fax: (416) 299-1322 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

549 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 3E5
Canada
Phone: (905) 554-0199
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Amberlea Medical Centre
2A-1822 Whites Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 492-8222
Fax: (905) 492-8444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Mansukhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mansukhani ( CPSO# 92669 )

Business Address:
2A-1822 Whites Road
Pickering ON  L1V 4M1
Phone Number: (905) 492-8222

Business Address:
549 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 3E5
Phone Number: (905) 554-0199

Business Address:
2361 Warden Avenue
Toronto ON  M1T 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 299-4999


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 May 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016 Active
 Dr.  Tarun  Ram  Mansukhani  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine.