skip to content

Mansour, Marlene

CPSO#: 96063

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Internal Medicine and Critical Care
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hany Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansour ( CPSO# 96063 )
Dr. H. Rizk ( CPSO# 92786 )

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
Division of Cardiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621


Corporation Name: Dr. Marlene Mansour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansour ( CPSO# 96063 )
Dr. H. Rizk ( CPSO# 92786 )

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
Internal Medicine and Critical Care
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARLENE MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016