skip to content

Mansour, Maged Mansour Assad

CPSO#: 88847

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1394 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton ON  L8W 1E7 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr M. Mansour & Dr E. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansour ( CPSO# 88847 )
Dr. E. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 111257)

Business Address:
101 The Queensway West
Suite 400
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 526-6250

Business Address:
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone Number: (905) 526-6250


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAGED MANSOUR ASSAD MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013