skip to content

Manson, Neil Anderson

CPSO#: 97392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEIL ANDERSON MANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018