skip to content

Manser, Courtney Anne

CPSO#: 90602

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mahler, Courtney Anne (used until: 30 Oct 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Palliative Shared Care Team
Prince Charles Medical Centre
555 Prince Charles Drive, 2nd Floor
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: 905-735-1701
Fax: (905) 735-1703 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Manser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Manser ( CPSO# 90602 )

Business Address:
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 4J6
Phone Number: (905) 735-1701

Business Address:
Port Colborne Hospital
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COURTNEY ANNE MANSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011