skip to content

Manning, Robert Frederick

CPSO#: 21277

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009