skip to content

Manning, Gregory Paul

CPSO#: 90268

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Institut
Division of Cardiac Anesthesiology
40 Ruskin Street
Room H2410
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 613-696-7381
Fax: 613-696-7099 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Memorial University of Newfoundland
Faculty of Medicine
Discipline of Anesthesia
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St. John's NL  A1B 3V6
Canada
Phone: 6139818971
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Manning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Manning ( CPSO# 90268 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Divison of Cardiac Anesthesiology
Room H2410
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7381

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL MANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANNING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 09 Mar 2009 to 03 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013