skip to content

Mann, Rick Rachhpal Singh

CPSO#: 91779

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MISSISSAUGA HOSPITAL
100 QUEENSWAY WEST
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. N & R Mann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mann ( CPSO# 89130 )
Dr. R. Mann ( CPSO# 91779 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
214-89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Business Address:
100 Queensway Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICK RACHHPAL SINGH MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011