skip to content

Manley, Paul Nathan

CPSO#: 21495

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2819
Fax: (613) 533-2907 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul N. Manley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Manley ( CPSO# 21495 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Pathology and Molecular Medicine
88 Stuart Street
Suite 201-B
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2819

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:21 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL NATHAN MANLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973