skip to content

Manji, Shazmeen

CPSO#: 101257

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue
Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-1562 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAZMEEN MANJI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MANJI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MANJI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MANJI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MANJI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MANJI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MANJI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019