skip to content

Manji, Farouq N

CPSO#: 96434

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
146 Queen St Unit B
Chatham ON  N7M 2G6
Phone: (519) 397 0635
Fax: 519 397 4123 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farouq Manji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Manji ( CPSO# 96434 )

Business Address:
146 Unit B
Queen St W
Chatham ON  N7M G6
Phone Number: 5193970635

Business Address:
438 Park Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 397-1577

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAROUQ N MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - General Surgery

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 02 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Western University, 03 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History