skip to content

Manji, Farah Naaz

CPSO#: 92904

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farah Naaz Manji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Manji ( CPSO# 92904 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARAH NAAZ MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016