skip to content

Manigat, Claude Charles

CPSO#: 28892

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education: University of Haiti, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Claude Manigat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Records Management 13-1 High Meadow PI Toronto  Ontario M9L O A3
toll free 1-800-775-0093
Fax 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 30 May 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:02 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2022