skip to content

Manickavasagam, Uma Shankar

CPSO#: 96519

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huron Perth Health Care Alliance
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Uma Shankar Manickavasagam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Manickavasagam ( CPSO# 96519 )

Business Address:
Huron Perth Health Care Alliance
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:27 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. UMA SHANKAR MANICKAVASAGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANICKAVASAGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016