skip to content

Manian, Usha Deivanai

CPSO#: 95317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K-W Cardiopulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519)741 5252
Fax: (519) 741 5772 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: U Manian S Suppiah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Manian ( CPSO# 95317 )
Dr. S. Suppiah ( CPSO# 96648 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:17 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. USHA DEIVANAI MANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 08 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 18 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Western University, 18 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2016