skip to content

Manhas, Kiran

CPSO#: 96514

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2011