skip to content

Manhas, Inderdeep Singh

CPSO#: 94525

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2044
2048 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V2
Phone: (416) 331-9111
Fax: (416) 331-9050 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 742-9449
Fax: (416) 742-6963
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 101
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Canada
Phone: 416-744-7900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Inderdeep Manhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Manhas ( CPSO# 94525 )

Business Address:
Suite 2044
2048 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V2
Phone Number: (416) 331-9111

Business Address:
Suites 101 & 106
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 744-7900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. INDERDEEP SINGH MANHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANHAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013