skip to content

Mandell, Howard Byron

CPSO#: 18707

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd Toronto, ON M1E 4B9
Date Received: 15 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.