skip to content

Mand, Ravinder Paul

CPSO#: 94228

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr. East
Brampton ON  L6R3J7
Phone: (905) 4942120 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Mand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mand ( CPSO# 94228 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Emergency Room
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Emergency Room
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAVINDER PAUL MAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 29 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012