skip to content

Mancini, Giovanni Battista John

CPSO#: 30363

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2012