skip to content

Mamelak, Adam Joseph

CPSO#: 88097

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
12319 North Mopac Expressway
Austin TX  78758
United States
Phone: (512) 837-3376
Fax: (512) 837-3377

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 304
13830 Sawyer Ranch Road
Dripping Springs TX  78620
United States
Phone: (512) 829-000
Fax: (512) 894-2268
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adam Mamelak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2012

Medical Records Location

Address:  Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-(800) 775-0093.
Date Received: 29 Nov 2011


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM JOSEPH MAMELAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMELAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008