skip to content

Maltez, Nancy Teixeira

CPSO#: 100501

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NANCY TEIXEIRA MALTEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018