skip to content

Maloney, Tshai Nkasi

CPSO#: 97328

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: 416-362-8822
Fax: 416-362-8877 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tshai Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Maloney ( CPSO# 97328 )

Business Address:
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Mar 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013 Active
 Dr. Tshai Nkasi Maloney may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.