Mallhi, Harkiran Kaur (CPSO#: 101272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 4H9
Phone: (519) 570-1200
Fax: (519) 570-1214
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Mallhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mallhi ( CPSO# 101272)

Business Address:
1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 4H9
Phone Number: (519) 570-1200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARKIRAN KAUR MALLHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015