skip to content

Mall, Austin

CPSO#: 90250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterloo Medical Clinic
13-170 University Ave W
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone: 519-725-1514
Fax: 519-725-5137 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

K-W Medical Clinic
100 The Board Walk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B4
Canada
Phone: 519-279-4098
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Mall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AUSTIN MALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011