skip to content

Malisic, Dragoljub

CPSO#: 91780

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A5
Phone: (647) 722-2370 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 university Avenue
Toronto ON  M5J2M4
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2150 Robertson Rd
Nepean ON  K2H 9S1
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 604-0277
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D. Malisic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Malisic ( CPSO# 91780 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
3107 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1E4
Phone Number: (647) 971-8383

Business Address:
900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A5
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DRAGOLJUB MALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALISIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 06 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011