skip to content

Malik, Mahmood Hassan

CPSO#: 30957

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2001