skip to content

Malik, Khalid Saeed

CPSO#: 91757

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 HOSPITAL DRIVE
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121 Ext. 3084 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Khalid Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malik ( CPSO# 91757 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 May 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active
             Dr.  Khalid Saaed Malik may practice medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.