Malik, Ashish (CPSO#: 99813)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Delhi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 07 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Mar 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013