skip to content

Maliakkal, Maya Rose

CPSO#: 98638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:George Washington University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
379 Church Street #202
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

59 Adelaide Street East
2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5C1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAYA ROSE MALIAKKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIAKKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014