skip to content

Malhotra, Neel Singh

CPSO#: 95762

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3250 Schmon Parkway
Unit 10
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: 289-479-0223
Fax: 289-479-0224 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neel Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Malhotra ( CPSO# 95762 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEEL SINGH MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015