skip to content

Malevich, Victoria Nikolayevna

CPSO#: 84840

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Minsk State Medical Institute, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stones Mill Family Health Centre
25 Mill Street
Gananoque ON  K7G 2L5
Phone: (613) 382-3974
Fax: (613) 382-4417 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Malevich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Malevich ( CPSO# 84840 )

Business Address:
Stones Mill Family Health Centre
25 Mill Street
Gananoque ON  K7G 2L5
Phone Number: (613) 382-3974

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTORIA NIKOLAYEVNA MALEVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008