skip to content

Malette, Jacqueline Renee

CPSO#: 96206

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3335 Dougall Avenue
Suite 101
Windsor ON  N9E1S8
Phone: 226-315-1100
Fax: 519-997-2300 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4411 Ext. 33742
Fax: 519-255-2212
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Malette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 25 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:28 Feb 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE RENEE MALETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015