skip to content

Maldeniya, Pramudith Manujaya

CPSO#: 98439

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TRILLIUM HEALTH PARTNERS
2085 HURONTARIO STREET.
SUITE 300.
MISSISSAUGA. ONTARIO. L5A 4G1
Mississauga ON  L5A 4G1
Phone: 905 848 7100 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRAMUDITH MANUJAYA MALDENIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALDENIYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017