skip to content

Malcolm, Barry William

CPSO#: 24788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, RM MG375
Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: 416 480 6775
Fax: 416 480 5990 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Working Condition Program
Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: 416 967 8699
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Barry W. Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Malcolm ( CPSO# 24788 )

Business Address:
MG 315 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6775

Business Address:
Holland Orthopaedic & Athritic Centre
Suite 317
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8783

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Orthopaedic Outpaitent Clinic M Gorund Access through Cathy Breutigam (416-480-6775 or cathy.breutigam@sunnybrook.ca) or RSRS: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 17 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARRY WILLIAM MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1972